LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB478
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB478
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB478
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 17, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 13, 2021
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 28, 2021
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 2, 2021
Compare
Bill
August 30, 2021
Compare
Bill
July 5, 2021
Compare
Bill
June 24, 2021
Compare
Bill
May 20, 2021
Compare
Bill
April 12, 2021
Compare