|
07/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 749.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|