Senate | 09/23/2021 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 942.) | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |