|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4899.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4853.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Set for hearing August 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4809.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5827.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1006.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 552.) (March 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|