Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 861.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |