California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021