|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2214.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2021
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1316.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1194.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 702.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|