California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill June 15, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021