Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/08/2020 | (Corrected December 9). | ||
Senate | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |