California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021