Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Set for hearing March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |