Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2021
|
Set for hearing January 5 in HOUSING pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|