Assembly | 06/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 6). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |