|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2565.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2021
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|