|
09/27/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 5347.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1195.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 955.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, L., P.E. & R., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|