California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021