California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill May 25, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021