California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Amended

Bill June 22, 2022
Bill May 25, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021