Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1196.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 703.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 552.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referral to Com. on G.O. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI., ED., and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|