California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021