Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2216.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|