|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2558.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 2917.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1196.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 777.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|