Assembly | 06/23/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1388.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Set for hearing March 10. | ||
Senate | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |