Assembly | 06/28/2022 | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1197.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2021 | Set for hearing May 17. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 956.) (April 28). | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |