California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021