Assembly | 07/01/2021 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2021 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |