Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1197.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 939.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 757.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|