California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 28, 2021
Bill June 16, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021