Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 27). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 14). | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |