Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
January 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2754.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|