Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1233.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 985.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., E.Q., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|