Assembly
|
07/29/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2021
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|