Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
(Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 5347.) (August 30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
That the Assembly amendments be concurred in.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5210.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Stone.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
(Corrected September 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2783.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 956.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|