Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 702.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|