Senate | 02/01/2022 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2021 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 422.) (March 9). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Set for hearing March 9. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |