California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 12, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2021

Amended

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021