|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5314.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2022
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
June 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1058.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|