Assembly | 06/09/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 749.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |