Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1201.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 703.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
March 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
March 17 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|