California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill April 8, 2021