Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 634.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |