Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|