|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2621.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 26. Page 3062.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 748.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 423.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|