Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
(Corrected July 14.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1202.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 916.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|