Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
June 27 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1204.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|