Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
June 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 1128.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 987.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|