Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1058.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 605.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|