|
06/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1576.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/16/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|