California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB81 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill July 1, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021