|
06/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 569.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 480.) (March 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Set for hearing March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|